Chalmersi Tehnikaülikool, professor 01.01.2001–...
Fiber Optic Communication Research Center at Chalmers, direktor 2010-2020
Lehigh University, Bethlehem, Pennsylvania, USA, külalisprofessor 01.01.2003–31.12.2004
Cenix Inc., Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA, director of research 01.01.2000–31.12.2003
Chalmersi Tehnikaülikool, bitr. professor 01.01.1995–31.12.2001
Head of fiber optic communication group, Chalmers University, Sweden 1992-2015
Chalmersi Tehnikaülikool, assistant professsor 01.01.1992–31.12.1995
AT&T Bell Laboratories, post-doctoral fellow 01.01.1989–31.12.1992
Chalmersi Tehnikaülikool, research assoc. 01.01.1988–31.12.1989